Kumar, Ashesh (CPSO#: 82716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
366 Bay Street
Suite 1000
Toronto ON  M5H4B2
Phone: 416 722 3393
Fax: 416 583 2232
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashesh Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kumar ( CPSO# 82716 )

Business Address:
1000 - 366 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 4B2
Phone Number: (416) 728-8901

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011