Kurdyak, Paul Andrew (CPSO#: 71392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction & Mental
Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34968
Fax: (416) 979-6810
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colton and Kurdyak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kurdyak ( CPSO# 71392 )
Dr. P. Colton ( CPSO# 70322 )

Business Address:
408 - 600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (647) 349-8311

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Room T305
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW KURDYAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURDYAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003