Kurukula Arachchi, Sandhya Pushpalatha (CPSO#: 85746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grace Medical Clinic
1070 Gainsborough Road
London ON  N6H 5L5
Phone: (519) 850-8774
Fax: (519) 850-8775
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kurukula Arachchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurukula Arachchi ( CPSO# 85746 )

Business Address:
Grace Medical Clinic
1070 Gainsborough Road
London ON  N6H 5L5
Phone Number: (519) 850-8774

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDHYA PUSHPALATHA KURUKULA ARACHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUKULA ARACHCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008