Kuruvilla, Mridula Sara (CPSO#: 79693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London, Ontario
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuruvilla ( CPSO# 79693 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MRIDULA SARA KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2009