Kwan, Kevin (CPSO#: 83158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Kwan, Kevin Win-Man (used until: 10 Jun 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-3920
Fax: (905) 875-4340
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kwan ( CPSO# 83158 )

Business Address:
205 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-3920

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010