Laba-Kaczmarek, Jessica Anne (CPSO#: 97190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Munger Ave W
PO Box 100
Harrow ON  N0R 1G0
Phone: (519) 738-4844
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Pollard drive
Harrow ON  N0R1G0
Canada
Phone: 5197382286
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Leamington District
Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laba-Kaczmarek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laba-Kaczmarek ( CPSO# 97190 )

Business Address:
Leamington District
Memorial Hosptail
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
32 Munger Avenue West
PO Box 100
Essex ON  N0R 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 738-3555

Business Address:
1 Pollard Drive
Essex ON  N0R 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 738-2286

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE LABA-KACZMAREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABA-KACZMAREK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018