Labib, Mahmoud (CPSO#: 95400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahmoud Labib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Labib ( CPSO# 95400 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMOUD LABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Apr 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016