Lad, Shilpa Vidyadhar (CPSO#: 83954)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 19 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Grant Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shilpa V. Lad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2013

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 04 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2012