Lai, Joe Heng (CPSO#: 86830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Lai, Heng Joe (used until: 19 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Phone: 9058551860
Fax: 9058551863
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KMH Cardiology and Diagnostic Ctrs
2075 Hadwen Road
Mississauga ON  L5K 2L3
Canada
Phone: (905) 855-1860 Ext. 231
Fax: (905) 855-1863
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joe H. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lai ( CPSO# 86830 )

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
100-13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOE HENG LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011