Lai, Jonathan Hin-Ching (CPSO#: 89331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. 42102
Fax: (416) 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan H. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lai ( CPSO# 89331 )
Dr. A. Tung ( CPSO# 88946 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN HIN-CHING LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2014