Lai, Samuel (CPSO#: 76445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11th Floor
151 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 2W7
Phone: (647) 498-8583
Fax: (647) 494-7788
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 102
304 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M9B 6E2
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-7968
Fax: (416) 231-7982
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samuel Lai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lai ( CPSO# 76445 )

Business Address:
151 Yonge Street
11th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2W7
Phone Number: (647) 498-8583

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003