Lal, Justiene (CPSO#: 90084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 RENFORTH DRIVE
Toronto ON  M9C2N2
Phone: (647) 547-8181
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1172 QUEEN ST EAST
Toronto ON  M4M 1L4
Canada
Phone: 647-547-8183
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lindholm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lal ( CPSO# 90084 )
Dr. J. Lindholm ( CPSO# 90097 )

Business Address:
9 - 460 Renforth Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2N2
Phone Number: (647) 547-8181


Corporation Name: Dr. Justiene Lal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lal ( CPSO# 90084 )

Business Address:
Unit 9
460 Renforth Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2N2
Phone Number: (647) 547-8181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIENE LAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 13 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 May 2009 to 02 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009