Lam Antoniades, Margarita Kleopatra (CPSO#: 76533)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ground Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Fax: (416) 864-6035
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent H.C. Lam and Margarita K. Lam Antoniades Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lam ( CPSO# 73979 )
Dr. M. Lam Antoniades ( CPSO# 76533 )

Business Address:
St. James Town Health Centre
Ground Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3096

Business Address:
720 King Street West
Unit 7
Toronto ON  M6K 1E6
Phone Number: (416) 963-9338

Business Address:
True North Medical Centre
1st Floor
69 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 640-2389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARITA KLEOPATRA LAM ANTONIADES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM ANTONIADES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003