Lam, David Lieude (CPSO#: 84536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General Hosp
Department of Emergency Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Four Counties Health Services
Department of Emergency Medicine
1824 Concession Dr
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Canada
Phone: 519-693-4441
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Alexandra Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: 519-485-1700
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David L. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam ( CPSO# 84536 )

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-4441

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LIEUDE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013