Lam, Emilie Yat-Yee (CPSO#: 93091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emilie Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lam ( CPSO# 93091 )

Business Address:
Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-2290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIE YAT-YEE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012