Lam, Janice Sze Wei (CPSO#: 90556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
920 King Street West
Suite 7
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone: 519-744-0800
Fax: 519-744-0180
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janice Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lam ( CPSO# 90556 )

Business Address:
Suite 7
920 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone Number: (416) 451-2986

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE SZE WEI LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)