Lam, Jennifer Kar-Yan (CPSO#: 90927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 718
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 971-7730
Fax: (416) 408-2802
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ryerson Medical Centre
Kerr Hall West 181
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Canada
Phone: (416) 979-5070
Fax: (416) 979-5073
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Hui Medicine Professional

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hui ( CPSO# 89124 )
Dr. J. Lam ( CPSO# 90927 )

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite 405
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 554-8650

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KAR-YAN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011