Lam, Kayla Kun-Yu (CPSO#: 95860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fountain Medical
Unit 14
9425 Leslie Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7
Phone: (905) 237-6189
Fax: (905) 737-4773
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kayla Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lam ( CPSO# 95860 )

Business Address:
Fountain Medical
9425 Leslie Street
Unit 14
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7
Phone Number: (416) 642-5932

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAYLA KUN-YU LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015