Lam, Michael Andrew Chi-Lun (CPSO#: 89789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All Med Health Family Medicine
Unit 1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone: (905) 895-9777
Fax: (905) 895-9720
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lam ( CPSO# 89789 )

Business Address:
All Med Health Family Medicine and Walk-In Clinic
Unit 1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 895-9777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW CHI-LUN LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010