Lamba, Ashvinder Kaur (CPSO#: 93044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community MD
Unit 6
10 Earlsbridge Boulevard
Brampton ON  L7A 3P1
Phone: (905) 840-4776
Fax: (905) 840-2197
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2245 Lawrence Avenue West
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 235-0201
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashvinder Lamba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lamba ( CPSO# 93044 )

Business Address:
2245 Lawrence Avenue West
Brampton ON  M9P 3W3
Phone Number: (905) 235-0201

Business Address:
Community MD
Unit 6
10 Earlsbridge Boulevard
Brampton ON  L7A 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 840-4776

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jan 2017 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHVINDER KAUR LAMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014