Langdon, Matthew Dean (CPSO#: 88968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2448
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Langdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Langdon ( CPSO# 88968 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
265 Dundas Street West
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
KGH
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW DEAN LANGDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013