Langevin, Melissa Kathleen (CPSO#: 92269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Division of Paediatric
Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Langevin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Langevin ( CPSO# 92269 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Department of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA KATHLEEN LANGEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGEVIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Nov 2009 to 20 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013