Lao, Victor Kock Chiu (CPSO#: 59794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 Langstaff Rd
Thornhill ON  L3T 3P8
Phone: (905) 709-9955
Fax: (905) 709-4138
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Lao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lao ( CPSO# 59794 )
Dr. C. Scullion ( CPSO# 59650 )

Business Address:
5th Floor
5700 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2M 4G8
Phone Number: (416) 212-6259

Business Address:
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 522-9002

Business Address:
28 Langstaff Road East
Thornhill ON  L3T 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 709-9955

Business Address:
1261 B Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4
Phone Number: (416) 490-0499

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR KOCK CHIU LAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989