Lau, Keith Kwong Hung (CPSO#: 91748)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith Lau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 17 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013