Lauder, Jacqueline Dawn (CPSO#: 90827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3500 Fallowfield Road
Unit 1C
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Lauder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lauder ( CPSO# 90827 )

Business Address:
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Business Address:
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 731-4660

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE DAWN LAUDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAUDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012