Laverdiere, Ginette Marie Blanche (CPSO#: 73412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. B. Laverdiere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Laverdiere ( CPSO# 73412 )

Business Address:
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 563-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINETTE MARIE BLANCHE LAVERDIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAVERDIERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001