Lavi, Shahar (CPSO#: 87345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3611
Fax: (519) 663-3117
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lavi ( CPSO# 87345 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
P.O. Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3611

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Sep 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Shahar  Lavi  may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
            cardiology.