Lawson, Adrian John (CPSO#: 90828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dufferin Area Family Health Team
1 Elizabeth St., Suite L1
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8802 Ext. 314
Fax: (519) 938-8128
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health Services
University of Guelph
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 821-2308
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN JOHN LAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014