Laza, Diana Carmen (CPSO#: 79700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Major Mckenzie Health System
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diana C. Laza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Laza ( CPSO# 79700 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA CARMEN LAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005