Lazier, Kate (CPSO#: 79205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7734
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Coderix Addiction Therapy
69 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 640-2384
Fax: (416) 981-8842
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Flemingdon Health Centre
10 Gateway Blvd
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 429-4991
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Southeast Toronto Family Health Tea
833 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E8
Canada
Phone: (416) 423-8800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kate Lazier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lazier ( CPSO# 79205 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
105 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2

Business Address:
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATE LAZIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005