LeMoine, Joseph Francis (CPSO#: 74176)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph LeMoine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 1B 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 03 Aug 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2010