Leduc, Dean Carey (CPSO#: 63565)

Current Status: Suspended as of 17 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leduc ( CPSO# 63565 )

Business Address:
100 - 2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 830-1298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 6, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 25, 2018, Montfort Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective October 6, 2017 Dr. Dean Leduc voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at Montfort Hospital during the course of an investigation by Montfort Hospital.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 17 Sep 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Sep 2018
Summary:

On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Dean Carey Leduc committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession, and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine 
that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Leduc is a general practitioner, with a practice in Orleans, Ontario. At all materials times, Dr. 
Leduc practised in a clinic setting that also operates as a walk-in clinic with 12 physicians.  
 
Patient A became a patient of Dr. Leduc in the late 1990s, when she was a teenager. Between 
approximately September 2003 and September 2013, Patient A saw Dr. Leduc for a variety of 
physical issues, including pain associated with ankle and humerus fractures and a dislocating 
shoulder, for which she eventually received disability insurance. Patient A also saw Dr. 
Leduc for a range of psychiatric issues, including an eating disorder, depression, anxiety, 
addiction to alcohol, addiction to narcotics and benzodiazepines, chronic pain and PTSD. 
 
Standard of Practice with Respect to Patient A 
 
After receiving information in September 2013, the College conducted an investigation into the 
allegations regarding Dr. Leduc's conduct and clinical care with respect to Patient A. An expert 
retained by the College reviewed Dr. Leduc's care of Patient A, including his prescribing of 
narcotics and related substances and opined, in part, that Dr. Leduc’s care of Patient A 
demonstrates:  
 
-   a significant lack of knowledge regarding safe prescribing habits for narcotics and 
    benzodiazepines; 
-   a significant lack of skill in managing Patient A’s numerous aberrant behaviors; and 
-   a staggering lack of judgment in his continuing prescriptions of medications to Patient A, 
    while being aware of the risk of addiction and harm to this patient.  
     
The expert noted that while he cannot say with certainty that Dr. Leduc's clinical practice, 
behaviour, or conduct expose or are likely to expose other patients to harm or injury, there are a 
number of indicators that raise concern. 
 
Boundary Violations with respect to Patient A 
 
In 2011, Patient A experienced a traumatic personal event and confided in Dr. Leduc. After 
discussing the events in some detail, and providing counselling, Dr. Leduc hugged Patient A in 
his office. Over the next two years, Dr. Leduc and Patient A would often hug at the end of an 
appointment. 
 
About a year later, criminal proceedings regarding the events of 2011 took place. During the 
proceedings, Dr. Leduc called Patient A from his cell phone and asked if she wanted to meet and 
talk. They arranged a time and place to meet and, once they had met, they went to a restaurant. 
Despite his knowledge that Patient A struggled with alcohol addiction, and the fact that she was 
on medications that he had prescribed to her, Dr. Leduc did not object to Patient A ordering 
wine, which he paid for in addition to her meal. Dr. Leduc disclosed personal information to 
Patient A during their discussion and, at the end of the encounter, Dr. Leduc drove Patient A 
home. Patient A continued to see Dr. Leduc after this meeting for regular follow up care and for 
supportive counselling. At this time, Dr. Leduc was prescribing Patient A large doses of Demerol 
by tablet and by injection, as well as benzodiazepines.  
 
A couple of months later, in 2012, Patient A experienced further physical trauma and, as a result 
of her injuries, Dr. Leduc assisted with her application for disability coverage. In late September 
2012, Dr. Leduc contacted Patient A again and offered to meet outside the office to talk. They 
met at a coffee shop during the day and talked for about one hour. At the end of the encounter 
they walked to Dr. Leduc's car and he drove Patient A home. Between June and September 2012, 
Dr. Leduc called Patient A on a few occasions from his cell phone. Patient A continued to see 
Dr. Leduc after the encounter in late September for regular follow up care, including her pain 
and mood medications, and for supportive counselling.  
 
In the spring of 2013, Dr. Leduc and Patient A met for a third time outside of his office. On this 
occasion, they met outside Patient A's apartment and walked from there to a restaurant, where 
Dr. Leduc again paid for Patient A's lunch and alcoholic drink. Dr. Leduc hugged Patient A 
and/or they exchanged kisses on the cheek during one or more than one of the three out of office 
encounters. 
 
Dr. Leduc recognizes that his conduct was inappropriate conduct for a physician towards his 
patient and that it breached physician-patient boundaries, especially in the context of Patient A's 
vulnerabilities. Dr. Leduc knew that Patient A had very few people she trusted or could turn to 
for support and, during this time, she endured significant physical and emotional trauma. 
 
Registrar’s Investigation  
 
In July 2015, as a result of the concerns regarding Dr. Leduc’s prescribing to Patient A raised in 
the expert’s report, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (ICRC) approved an 
appointment of investigators in order to conduct a broader investigation into Dr. Leduc’s 
prescribing practices.  Another expert was retained by the College to provide an opinion with 
respect to Dr. Leduc’s standard of care, including his prescribing of narcotics and 
benzodiazepines. This expert reviewed ten patient charts and conducted an interview with Dr. 
Leduc, during which Dr. Leduc advised that after receiving notice of the public complaint, he 
completed the three-part Safe Opioid Prescribing program at the University of Toronto in 
January 2014.   
 
Upon the College’s request, the expert provided an addendum report, dated February 21, 2017, 
with respect to the standard of care provided by Dr. Leduc before he took the Safe Opioid 
Prescribing program and made changes to his practice. The expert opined that prior to January 
2014, Dr. Leduc: 
 
-   did not meet the standard of practice of the profession in six out of ten charts;  
-   displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment in seven out of ten charts; and  
-   in five out of ten charts, Dr. Leduc’s clinical practice exposed patients to harm or injury.   
Relevant Remediation and Education 
 
At the conclusion of the Registrar’s Investigation, the ICRC reviewed and considered the 
material and ordered Dr. Leduc to participate in a Specified Continuing Education and 
Remediation Program (SCERP), which required Dr. Leduc, among other things, to: 
 
 -  practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor for a period of six months; 
 -  re-take all three webinars and the workshop that comprise the Safe Opioid Prescribing 
    program at the University of Toronto; and    
 -  have biweekly meetings with the supervisor for two months and monthly meetings for four 
    months.   
     
Dr. Leduc registered in and successfully completed the three-part series from March to May 
2018, and completed the workshop component in June 2018. Dr. Leduc’s clinical supervisor 
conducted the supervision between December 2017 and May 2018, and provided a total of eight  
reports to the College’s Compliance Case Manager. Dr. Leduc has completed all aspects of the 
SCERP with the exception of the reassessment, which was directed to occur approximately six 
months following the completion of the remediation.   
 
In  addition, Dr.  Leduc  enrolled  in  and  successfully  completed  a  boundaries  course  at  the 
Schulich School of Medicine at the University of Western Ontario on March 21 to 22, 2014.   
 
Disposition 
 
On September 17, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:  
 
-   Dr. Leduc attend before the panel to be reprimanded.  
-   the Registrar suspend Dr. Leduc's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, 
    effective immediately. 
-   Dr. Leduc pay to the College costs in the amount of $16,012.00, within thirty (30) days of 
    the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 17, 2018

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)