Lee, Colin Quek-Tze (CPSO#: 72317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka District Health Unit
15 Sperling Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6K9
Phone: (705) 721-7520
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: 7057920933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colin Q-T Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 72317 )

Business Address:
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Suite 102
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka District Health Unit
15 Sperling Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6K9
Phone Number: (705) 721-7520

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN QUEK-TZE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002