Lee, Deborah (CPSO#: 80969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Road
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 319-2000
Fax: (905) 319-6292
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Robert Yang & Deborah Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yang ( CPSO# 75200 )
Dr. D. Lee ( CPSO# 80969 )

Business Address:
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Road
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Nephrology - Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006