Lee, Jason Young (CPSO#: 81030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: Lee, Jason (used until: 21 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
585 University Avenue
TGH 11th floor
PMB Rm 186
Toronto ON  M2G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3855
Fax: (416) 340-4500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 Bond St
Cardinal Carter 5th Floor
Lithotripsy Unit
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Y Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 81030 )

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
TGH 11th Floor
PBM Room 186
Toronto ON  M2G 2N2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON YOUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011