Lee, Linda May (CPSO#: 80942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oncology Department WFCC
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 682-6451
Fax: (905) 682-3391
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda M. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lee ( CPSO# 80942 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Walker Family Cancer Centre
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 682-6451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA MAY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008