Lee, Tsu-Yee Joseph (CPSO#: 91905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Surrey Memorial Hospital
13750 - 96 Ave
Surrey BC  V3V 1Z2
Phone: 604-585-5666
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TY Joseph Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TSU-YEE JOSEPH LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014