Leeper, William Robert (CPSO#: 86823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of General Surgery
800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital - Room E2-215
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8547
Fax: 519 685 8775
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.R. Leeper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leeper ( CPSO# 86823 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of General Surgery
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite E2-215
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8547

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ROBERT LEEPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEEPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012