Lefebvre, Guylaine Gisele (CPSO#: 55434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMPA
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000 Ext. 774
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guylaine Lefebvre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lefebvre ( CPSO# 55434 )
Dr. M. Lebeau ( CPSO# 55440 )

Business Address:
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUYLAINE GISELE LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1991