Legault, Kimberly Janet (CPSO#: 86543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
A3-14, Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St.
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43778
Fax: 905-297-9000
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legault & Oczkowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Legault ( CPSO# 86543 )
Dr. S. Oczkowski ( CPSO# 90622 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-20
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3-14
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 25 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JANET LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012