Leifer, Randy Jay (CPSO#: 58260)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randy Leifer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leifer ( CPSO# 58260 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: 20 Doctor's Ln King City ON L7B 1G2
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018