Lemos, Vivienne Miriam (CPSO#: 93244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Suite 300
Box 5
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 960-1366
Fax: (416) 960-1945
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win
Health Centre
P O Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Canada
Phone: (807) 737-3030
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Ryerson Medical Centre
Kerr Hall West 181
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Canada
Phone: (416) 979-5070
Fax: 416-979-5073
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dash Lemos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lemos ( CPSO# 93244 )
Dr. S. Dash ( CPSO# 97048 )

Business Address:
Ryerson Medical Centre
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3

Business Address:
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Suite 300
Box 5
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 960-1366

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Adult Endocrinology and Metabolism
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 581-7487

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
P.O. Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIENNE MIRIAM LEMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012