Lenny, Adam Mark (CPSO#: 91374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd.
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Mark Lenny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lenny ( CPSO# 91374 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM MARK LENNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012