Lentz, Vanessa Juliane (CPSO#: 95992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mood Disorders Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 33605
Fax: 905-381-5629
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Psychiatric Emergency Services
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Lentz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Lentz ( CPSO# 95992 )

Business Address:
Women's Health Concerns Clinic
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street, West 5th Campus
Mood Disorders Program
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA JULIANE LENTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016