Leonard, Blair John Normand (CPSO#: 82942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
219 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W9
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 988-5776
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blair J. N. Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leonard ( CPSO# 82942 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
219 Queenston Road
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W8
Phone Number: (905) 685-8082

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAIR JOHN NORMAND LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010