Leonard, Kevin Christopher (CPSO#: 90506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone: (613) 342-9756
Fax: (613) 342-1119
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin C. Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leonard ( CPSO# 90506 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone Number: (613) 342-9756

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHRISTOPHER LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014