Leone, James Mauro (CPSO#: 73410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B4D
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 624-5999
Fax: (519) 624-1117
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 bathurst street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

HHS - McMaster Univ Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
P O Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leone ( CPSO# 73410 )

Business Address:
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Unit B4D
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 624-5999

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
1200 Main Stret West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES MAURO LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004