Lerm, Leon Bean (CPSO#: 82389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-6164
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 McPherson Street
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: 705 286 2140
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leon Lerm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lerm ( CPSO# 82389 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEON BEAN LERM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LERM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007