Leshchyshyn, Yevheniy Yevhenovych (CPSO#: 96140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Danylo Halytsky Lviv State Med Univ, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leshchyshyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Leshchyshyn ( CPSO# 96140 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YEVHENIY YEVHENOVYCH LESHCHYSHYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LESHCHYSHYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015