Leung, James Sze-Chuck (CPSO#: 90741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
1280 Main Street W
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone: (905)521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2540 Postmaster Dr, Oakville, ON L6
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Canada
Phone: (905) 847-5437
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3885 Duke of York Blvd C107
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 366-4441
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Sze-Chuck Leung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leung ( CPSO# 90741 )

Business Address:
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 847-5437

Business Address:
3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Suite C107
Mississauga ON  L5B 0E4
Phone Number: (905) 366-4441

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES SZE-CHUCK LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015